AL HB256 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Forwarded to Governor at 6:50 p.m. on June 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Forwarded to Governor at 6:50 p.m. on June 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles, dealer license plates, number and use limited, transit plates provided for, Sec. 40-12-264 am'd.
Title
Motor vehicles, dealer license plates, number and use limited, transit plates provided for, Sec. 40-12-264 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Forwarded to Governor at 6:50 p.m. on June 2, 2011. | |
2011-06-02 | Assigned Act No. 2011-554 on 06/09/2011. | |
2011-06-02 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-02 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2011-06-02 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-02 | Passed Second House | |
2011-06-02 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 999 | |
2011-06-02 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-03 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-04-19 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities | |
2011-04-19 | Engrossed | |
2011-04-19 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 330 | |
2011-04-19 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 329 | |
2011-04-19 | Johnson (R) Amendment Offered | |
2011-04-19 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-31 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-03-22 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business |