AL HB256 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-19 - Forwarded to Governor on April 19, 2012 at 3:30 p. m. on April 19, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-19 - Forwarded to Governor on April 19, 2012 at 3:30 p. m. on April 19, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Class 2 municipalities (Mobile), city council, vacancies filled by a special election, setting of date, Sec. 11-44C-22 am'd.
Title
Class 2 municipalities (Mobile), city council, vacancies filled by a special election, setting of date, Sec. 11-44C-22 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Barton [R] | Rep. James Buskey [D] | Rep. Randy Davis [R] | Rep. Chad Fincher [R] |
Rep. Victor Gaston [R] | Rep. James Ison [R] | Rep. Yvonne Kennedy [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 34 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 34 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-19 | Forwarded to Governor on April 19, 2012 at 3:30 p. m. on April 19, 2012. | |
2012-04-19 | Assigned Act No. 2012-245. | |
2012-04-19 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-04-19 | Enrolled | |
2012-04-19 | Signature Requested | |
2012-04-19 | Passed Second House | |
2012-04-19 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 677 | |
2012-04-19 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-12 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-03-22 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 3 | |
2012-03-22 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 420 | |
2012-03-22 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-20 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-02-09 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Mobile County Legislation |