AL HB451 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - Constitution, Campaigns and Elections first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - Constitution, Campaigns and Elections first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Elections, write-in candidate to file request with Secretary of State, required, Sec. 17-6-28 am'd.
Title
Elections, write-in candidate to file request with Secretary of State, required, Sec. 17-6-28 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-14 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 78) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 80 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 86 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 80 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 86 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | House | Constitution, Campaigns and Elections first Amendment Offered |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Ethics and Elections |
2015-05-14 | House | Engrossed |
2015-05-14 | House | Cosponsors Added |
2015-05-14 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 755 |
2015-05-14 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 754 |
2015-05-14 | House | Constitution, Campaigns and Elections Amendment Offered |
2015-05-14 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2015-04-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections |