AL HB6 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to parental rights; to establish legislative findings relating to the fundamental rights of parents; and to provide that the government may not burden certain fundamental rights of parents.
Title
Relating to parental rights; to establish legislative findings relating to the fundamental rights of parents; and to provide that the government may not burden certain fundamental rights of parents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-31 - Senate - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - Adopt 6O4MZZ-1 (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - Table BAXKJQ-1 (Y: 84 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - Adopt 6O4MZZ-1 (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - Table BAXKJQ-1 (Y: 84 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | House | Enacted |
2023-06-01 | House | Enrolled |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Ready to Enroll |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-05-31 | Senate | On Third Reading in Second House |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Children and Youth Health |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee to Senate Children and Youth Health |
2023-05-25 | House | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-05-24 | House | Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended |
2023-05-24 | House | Adopt 6O4MZZ-1 |
2023-05-24 | House | Table BAXKJQ-1 |
2023-05-02 | House | Carry Over to the Call of the Chair |
2023-05-02 | House | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-04-12 | House | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-04-12 | House | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-04-12 | House | Reported Favorably from House Judiciary |
2023-04-12 | House | Amendment/Substitute by House Judiciary BAXKJQ-1 |
2023-04-03 | House | Amendment/Substitute by House Judiciary YD4Y6N-1 |
2023-01-20 | House | Introduced and Referred to House Judiciary |
2023-01-20 | House | Prefiled |