AL HB7 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - Pending third reading on day 22 Favorable from Governmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - Pending third reading on day 22 Favorable from Governmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Elections, election officers, Legislature by local law authorized to appoint alternate election officers, Sec. 17-8-1 am'd.
Title
Elections, election officers, Legislature by local law authorized to appoint alternate election officers, Sec. 17-8-1 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Pending third reading on day 22 Favorable from Governmental Affairs | |
2011-04-27 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs | |
2011-05-03 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-04-26 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 506 | |
2011-04-26 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-03 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-03-01 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections |