AL HJR17 | 2015 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-09-16 - Marsh motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-09-16 - Marsh motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Congress, urged to reform the Americans with Disabilities Act
Title
Congress, urged to reform the Americans with Disabilities Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-16 | Senate | Marsh motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote |
2015-09-14 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote |
2015-09-16 | Senate | Reported from Rules and carried over |
2015-09-11 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2015-09-11 | House | McCutcheon motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2015-09-11 | House | Reported from Rules |
2015-09-10 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |