AL SB4 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Foreign law, application in violation of rights guaranteed United States and Alabama citizens, prohibited, exceptions, American and Alabama Laws for Alabama Courts Amendment, const. amend.
Title
Foreign law, application in violation of rights guaranteed United States and Alabama citizens, prohibited, exceptions, American and Alabama Laws for Alabama Courts Amendment, const. amend.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 75 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - House - Motion to Previous Question (Y: 64 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - House - Motion to Previous Question (Y: 64 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2013-269. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-05-20 | House | Bracy intended to vote "Nay" |
2013-05-20 | House | Signature Requested |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2013-05-20 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1275 |
2013-05-20 | House | Motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 1274 |
2013-05-20 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-04 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-03-20 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 247 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 246 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |