AL SB6 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-29 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Ways and Means General Fund
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-29 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Ways and Means General Fund
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Gulf of Mexico Energy Security Act of 2006, legislative intent relating to the expending of funds by the Dept. of Conservation and Natural Resources expressed
Title
Gulf of Mexico Energy Security Act of 2006, legislative intent relating to the expending of funds by the Dept. of Conservation and Natural Resources expressed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1097 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 1096 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - SBIR: Elliott motion to Adopt Roll Call 1095 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 1096 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - SBIR: Elliott motion to Adopt Roll Call 1095 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Ways and Means General Fund |
2021-04-29 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-04-20 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Engrossed |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1097 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1096 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Orr Amendment Offered |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Taxation General Fund as Favorable |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |