AL SB8 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-15 - Pending third reading on day 24 Favorable from Urban and Rural Development
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-15 - Pending third reading on day 24 Favorable from Urban and Rural Development
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Property, homeowner's associations and condominium associations, prohibited from restricting display of state flag
Title
Property, homeowner's associations and condominium associations, prohibited from restricting display of state flag
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 451 (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - SBIR: Elliott motion to Adopt Roll Call 233 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - SBIR: Elliott motion to Adopt Roll Call 233 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | House | Pending third reading on day 24 Favorable from Urban and Rural Development |
2021-04-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-03-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Urban and Rural Development |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 451 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Elliott motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |