AZ SB1087 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Drug testing records; taxi drivers
Title
Drug testing records; taxi drivers
Sponsors
Rep. Judy Burges [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | Governor Signed | |
2013-05-02 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2013-04-16 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-04-16 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (47-13-0-0) |
2013-04-09 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-04-09 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-04-08 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2013-02-19 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-03-14 | House | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-0-0) |
2013-02-19 | House | Referred to House TRANS Committee |
2013-03-06 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-2-0-0-0) |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to House COM Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | House read second time |
2013-02-19 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-19 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2013-02-19 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2013-02-19 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: proper For Consideration with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Senate TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate TRANS Committee |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TRANS Committee |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |