AZ SB1087 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - House RULES Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - House RULES Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
DCS reports; study; report
Title
DCS reports; study; report
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House Health Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House Health Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | House | House RULES Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2018-03-22 | House | House HEALTH Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2018-02-20 | House | House read second time |
2018-02-19 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-02-19 | House | Assigned to House HEALTH Committee |
2018-02-19 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2018-01-29 | House | Transmit to House |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-0) |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |