AZ SB1087 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-1-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-1-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Podiatry board; licensure; fingerprinting; fees
Title
Podiatry board; licensure; fingerprinting; fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefile |
Subjects
Fees
Fingerprinting
Licensure
Podiatry Board
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
State Board Of Podiatry Examiners
Fingerprinting
Licensure
Podiatry Board
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
State Board Of Podiatry Examiners
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 823 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 826 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 830 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 854.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 855 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |