AZ SB1087 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-4-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-4-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations; unfunded liability; corrections; safety
Title
Appropriations; unfunded liability; corrections; safety
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-28 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-4-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-09 | House | House GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-3-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-24 | House | House read second time |
2022-02-23 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-02-08 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (25-2-3-0) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-1-0) |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Prefile |
Subjects
Appropriating Monies
Appropriations
Corrections
Psprs (see Also: Public Safety Personnel Retirement System)
Public Safety Personnel Retirement System (psprs)
Safety
Unfunded Liability
Appropriations
Corrections
Psprs (see Also: Public Safety Personnel Retirement System)
Public Safety Personnel Retirement System (psprs)
Safety
Unfunded Liability