CA AB1511 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-08-20 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
Pending: Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-08-20 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
Pending: Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 17276, 17276.9, 24416, and 24416.9, and 25128 of, to add Sections 17276.11, 17276.12, 17276.13, 23663.1, 24416.11, 24416.12, 24416.13, and 25128.7 to, and to repeal Sections 17276.10, 23663, 24416.10, and 25128.5 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Income taxes: net operating losses: credit sharing:
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-07-07 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Assembly - AB 1511 DE LEON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Assembly - AB 1511 DE LEON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-20 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2010-08-12 | In committee: Placed on REV. & TAX. suspense file. | |
2010-08-05 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2010-08-02 | Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). | |
2010-07-15 | From inactive file. Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2009-09-10 | To inactive file on motion of Senator Cedillo. | |
2009-07-09 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-07-08 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 7). | |
2009-06-17 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 17). | |
2009-05-21 | Referred to Coms. on ED. and PUB. S. | |
2009-05-14 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-14 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 1. Page 1463.) | |
2009-04-30 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-04-29 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2009-04-28 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 28). | |
2009-04-23 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 22). | |
2009-04-15 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-04-14 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-13 | Referred to Coms. on ED. and PUB. S. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To print. |