CA AB1537 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-29 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Stern.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-29 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Stern.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1272.5 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to skilled nursing facilities.
Title
Skilled nursing facilities: direct care spending requirement.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1537 Wood Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-08-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1537 Wood Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-29 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Stern. |
2024-06-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-06-17 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2024-06-17 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2023-09-07 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Stern. |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (September 1). |
2023-08-14 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2023-07-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 2. Page 2046.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (May 18). |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-05-03 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1272.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |