CA AB1859 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 684, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 684, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 27523 to the Government Code, relating to coroners.
Title
Coroners: duties.
Sponsors
Asm. Juan Alanis [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1859 Alanis Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1859 Alanis By Seyarto (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1859 Alanis Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1859 Alanis By Seyarto (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1859 Alanis Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 684, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-09-11 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2024-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-20 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-08-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 15). |
2024-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2024-08-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-07-29 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on PUB S. and HEALTH. |
2024-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2024-03-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2024-02-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (February 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-01-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-01-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 18. |
2024-01-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 27523 | New Code | See Bill Text |