CA AB2061 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-28 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-28 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 5 (commencing with Section 8380) to Division 4.1 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Electric distribution: efficiency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |
2010-05-12 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2010-04-22 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (April 19). | |
2010-04-07 | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | |
2010-04-06 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-04-05 | Referred to Com. on U. & C. | |
2010-02-19 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | |
2010-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |