CA AB2061 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-26 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Beall.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-26 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Beall.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 18262 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.
Title
Child welfare services: families experiencing homelessness.
Sponsors
Asm. Edwin Chau [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2061 CHAU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2061 CHAU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-26 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Beall. |
2014-08-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2014-06-10 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 6. Page 5350.) |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11009.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11420 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18262 | New Code | See Bill Text |