CA AB2086 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-17 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-17 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 3003.6 to the Penal Code, relating to registered sex offenders.
Title
Registered sex offenders: local ordinances.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Ammiano [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-04-09 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-03-29 | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-02-24 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | |
2012-02-23 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 11169 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 3003.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |