CA AB2102 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 15819.405 to, and to add Chapter 3.2.3 (commencing with Section 15819.42) to Part 10b of Division 3 of Title 2 of, the Government Code, relating to county jail construction, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Revenue bond financing of prison construction: Phase III.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |
2012-04-25 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-04-18 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-09 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-03-29 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-02-24 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | |
2012-02-23 | Read first time. To print. |