CA AB2102 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-21 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-21 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 26039 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to cannabis.
Title
Cannabis: facilities used for unlawful purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2102 Jones-Sawyer Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-21 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and B., P. & E.D. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4911.) |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 11). |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-03-31 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2022-03-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 29). |
2022-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and B. & P. |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2022-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 26039 | New Code | See Bill Text |