CA AB2452 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 705, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 705, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 25503.4, 25503.56, and 25503.57 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.
Title
Alcoholic beverages: tied-house restrictions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2452 AGUIAR-CURRY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2452 Aguiar-Curry et al. By Dodd (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Assembly - AB 2452 AGUIAR-CURRY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2452 Aguiar-Curry et al. By Dodd (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Assembly - AB 2452 AGUIAR-CURRY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 705, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-07 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6883.). |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 28). |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2018-08-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5568.). |
2018-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-14 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4900.) |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 18). |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 25500.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 25502.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 25503.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 25503.56 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 25503.57 | Amended Code | Citation Text |