CA AB2492 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 7 (commencing with Section 43900) to Chapter 4 of Part 5 of Division 26 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to vehicular air pollution.
Title
Medium duty vehicles: pilot program.
Sponsors
Asm. Rudy Salas [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 43900 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44280 | Amended Code | Citation Text |