CA AB2703 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-08-03 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-08-03 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 20.1 (commencing with Section 2704.30) to Division 3 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Transportation: bond-funded projects: letter of no
Sponsors
Asm. John Perez [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-20 - Assembly - AB 2703 PEREZ, J. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-20 - Assembly - AB 2703 PEREZ, J. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-03 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-08-02 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-07-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-06-30 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29). | |
2010-06-03 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2010-05-20 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-05-20 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5237.) | |
2010-05-18 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-05-17 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2010-05-13 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (May 12). | |
2010-04-28 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-27 | Read second time and amended. | |
2010-04-26 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 19). | |
2010-04-12 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2010-04-08 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-02-22 | Read first time. | |
2010-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. To print. |