CA AB2747 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 279, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 279, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1954.07 to the Civil Code, relating to tenancy.
Title
Tenancy: credit reporting.
Sponsors
Asm. Matt Haney [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2747 Haney Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 56 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2747 Haney By Wiener (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Assembly - AB 2747 Haney Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2747 Haney By Wiener (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Assembly - AB 2747 Haney Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 279, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-09-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-09-11 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 14.). |
2024-08-29 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. |
2024-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2024-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 8.). |
2024-08-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-20 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 18). |
2024-06-10 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 13.) |
2024-05-13 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (April 9). |
2024-03-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1954.07 | New Code | See Bill Text |