CA AB3280 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 228, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 228, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 69894 of, and to add Section 69894.2 to, the Government Code, relating to courts.
Title
Superior court: lactation rooms: Judicial Council report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-28 - Senate - Special Consent AB3280 JUD. (Kalra) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Assembly - AB 3280 Judiciary Assembly Third Reading By KALRA (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Assembly - AB 3280 Judiciary Assembly Third Reading By KALRA (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 228, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-09-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2024-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2024-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 15). |
2024-08-05 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2024-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2024-02-29 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 69894 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 69894.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |