CA AB480 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 743, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 743, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 25510 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to hazardous materials.
Title
Hazardous materials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-07 - Assembly - AB 480 Carrillo Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB480 Carrillo et al. By Durazo (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 480 Carrillo Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB480 Carrillo et al. By Durazo (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 480 Carrillo Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 743, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2021-09-07 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 2827.). |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 4. Page 2346.). |
2021-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-23 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-07-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1693.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 14. Page 1845.) |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20). |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-04-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2021-03-30 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2021-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 11. |
2021-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 25510 | Amended Code | Citation Text |