CA AB796 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 26 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-09-03 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on August 26 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-09-03 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 26 (commencing with Section 2529.8.1) to Chapter 5 of Division 2 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to athletic trainers.
Title
Athletic trainers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-26 - Assembly - AB 796 Weber Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB796 Weber By Stern (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 796 Weber Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB796 Weber By Stern (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 796 Weber Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-03 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2024-08-26 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2024-08-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.). |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-06-26 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2024-06-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2024-06-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2024-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB S. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2023-07-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. |
2023-06-28 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E. D. and PUB S. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 1. Page 1993.) |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1850.) |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-05-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 25). |
2023-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2023-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2023-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on A., E., S., & T. |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A., E., S., & T. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on A., E., S., & T. and B. & P. |
2023-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2023-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2529.8.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |