CA AB832 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to surgical clinics.
Title
Ambulatory surgical clinics: workgroup.
Sponsors
Asm. Dave Jones [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-02 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2010-01-31 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |
2009-05-28 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |
2009-05-20 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-05-06 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-05 | Read second time and amended. | |
2009-05-04 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 28). | |
2009-04-23 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-04-22 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-03-23 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2009-02-26 | Read first time. To print. |