CA ACA7 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 22 2008 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-20 - Referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 22 2008 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-20 - Referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Section 31 of Article I thereof, relating to public education.
Title
Public education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-20 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2009-01-05 | Read first time. | |
2008-12-23 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 22. | |
2008-12-22 | Introduced. To print. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=aca_7&sess=0910&house=A |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/aca_7_bill_20081222_introduced.html |