CA ACA7 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-24 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-24 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Section 2 of Article II thereof, relating to elections.
Title
Elections: voting age.
Sponsors
Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] | Asm. Tom Ammiano [D] | Asm. Steve Fox [D] | Asm. Richard Gordon [D] |
Sen. Mark Leno [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-07 - Assembly - Be adopted and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. |
2013-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-04 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E. & R. and APPR. |
2013-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2013-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |