CA SB495 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-29 - In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-29 - In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to postsecondary education employees.
Title
Postsecondary education employees: physicians.
Sponsors
Sen. Leland Yee [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB495 Yee (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 1088.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended. |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 787.) (May 1). |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 89528.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 92612.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |