CA SB495 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 224, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 224, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2081 and 5050 of, and to add Section 2081.12 to, the Fish and Game Code, relating to protected species, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Protected species: blunt-nosed leopard lizard: taking or possession.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Vidak [R] | Asm. Devon Mathis [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB495 Vidak et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-07 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-05 - Assembly - SB 495 Vidak Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Water, Parks, and Wildlife] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB495 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-07 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-05 - Assembly - SB 495 Vidak Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Water, Parks, and Wildlife] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB495 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 224, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-08-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-15 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-09 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5224.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-07 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 5202.) |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5170.) Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2018-07-05 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-07-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 6110.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-07-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2018-04-09 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 769.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19601.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 2081 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 2081.12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 5050 | Amended Code | Citation Text |