CA SB743 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on September 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 386, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on September 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 386, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 65088.1 and 65088.4 of the Government Code, and to amend Sections 21181, 21183, 21186, 21187, 21189.1, and 21189.3 of, to add Section 21155.4 to, to add Chapter 2.7 (commencing with Section 21099) to Division 13 of, to add and repeal Section 21168.6.6 of, and to repeal and add Section 21185 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.
Title
Environmental quality: transit oriented infill projects, judicial review streamlining for environmental leadership development projects, and entertainment and sports center in the City of Sacramento.
Sponsors
Sen. Darrell Steinberg [D] | Sen. Ted Gaines [R] | Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D] | Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] |
Sen. Lois Wolk [D] | Asm. Ken Cooley [D] | Asm. Roger Dickinson [D] | Asm. Dan Logue [R] |
Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-12 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SB743 Steinberg Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - Assembly - SB 743 Steinberg Senate Third Reading By DICKINSON (Y: 56 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-09-06 - Assembly - SB 743 Steinberg Senate Third Reading Amend By DICKINSON Set #1 (Y: 52 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB743 Steinberg (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - Assembly - SB 743 Steinberg Senate Third Reading By DICKINSON (Y: 56 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-09-06 - Assembly - SB 743 Steinberg Senate Third Reading Amend By DICKINSON Set #1 (Y: 52 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB743 Steinberg (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 386, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-23 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2013-09-12 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E.Q. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 2419.) Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2453.) Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 2421.) |
2013-09-12 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 15. Page 3342.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-09-11 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) file notice (Com. on NAT. RES.) suspended. (Page 3189.) Joint Rule 62(a) file notice (Com. on L. GOV.) suspended. (Page 3247.) From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (September 11). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (September 11). |
2013-09-10 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 3032.) |
2013-09-06 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 52. Noes 20. Page 2940.) Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-22 | Assembly | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2013-08-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 607.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 389.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2013-02-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65088.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65088.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21155.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 21168.6.6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21181 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21183 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21185 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 21186 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21187 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21189.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21189.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 739.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |