CA SB743 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 572, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 572, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 14132.07 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal: family planning providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB743 Hernandez et al. Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Assembly - SB 743 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By GONZALEZ FLETCHER (Y: 55 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB743 Hernandez et al (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Assembly - SB 743 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By GONZALEZ FLETCHER (Y: 55 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB743 Hernandez et al (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 572, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-21 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m. |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 2893.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-14 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 21. Page 3253.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (September 1). |
2017-07-19 | Assembly | July 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and APPR. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 1261.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | May 15 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | May 8 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 808.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and APPR. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14132.07 | New Code | See Bill Text |