CA SB743 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-08-26 - August 26 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-08-26 - August 26 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 8.8 (commencing with Section 1650) to Part 1 of Division 1 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to broadband.
Title
Housing developments: broadband adoption: grant program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB743 Bradford (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB743 Bradford (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-26 | Assembly | August 26 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-07-13 | Assembly | (Corrected July 14.) |
2021-07-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-13 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-07-05 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2021-06-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on C. & C. and H. & C.D. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1256.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1202.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | May 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Set for hearing May 10. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 916.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | April 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and E., U. & C. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 1650 | New Code | See Bill Text |