CA SB747 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2190.1, 2811.5, 2892.5, 2915, 3524.5, 4517, 4980.54, and 4996.22 of the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Section 1337.3 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Continuing education: lesbian, gay, bisexual, and
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-02 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB747 Kehoe Concurrence (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-01 - Assembly - SB 747 Kehoe Senate Third Reading By ATKINS (Y: 47 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB747 Kehoe (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-01 - Assembly - SB 747 Kehoe Senate Third Reading By ATKINS (Y: 47 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB747 Kehoe (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. Veto sustained. | |
2011-10-09 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2011-10-09 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2011-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2011-09-02 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 2272.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-09-01 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2011-09-01 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 47. Noes 26. Page 2783.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-08-29 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-26 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-07-13 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-07-06 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-06-21 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-13 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2011-05-23 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2011-05-16 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-05-16 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 982.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-11 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-10 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 929.) (May 9). | |
2011-04-29 | Set for hearing May 9. | |
2011-04-25 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-13 | Set for hearing May 2. | |
2011-04-12 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 617.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-04 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2011-03-25 | Set for hearing April 11. | |
2011-03-24 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-03-18 | Set for hearing April 4. | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2070.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2190.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2811.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2892.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2915 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3524.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4517 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4980.54 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4996.22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1337.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |