CA SCR139 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-27 - In Assembly. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-27 - In Assembly. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Eugene "Gene" Chappie Memorial Highway.
Title
Eugene "Gene" Chappie Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-27 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SCR139 Gaines (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2014-08-27 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4902.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 4485.) (August 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-08-07 | Senate | Set for hearing August 12. |
2014-08-05 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |