DC B25-0018 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Law L25-0002, Effective from Apr 19, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 006320, Expires on Nov 30, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Law L25-0002, Effective from Apr 19, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 006320, Expires on Nov 30, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tipped Minimum Wage Increase Implementation Clarification Temporary Amendment Act of 2023
Title
Tipped Minimum Wage Increase Implementation Clarification Temporary Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Council | Law L25-0002, Effective from Apr 19, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 006320, Expires on Nov 30, 2023 |
2023-03-07 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2023-03-03 | Council | Act A25-0013 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 002648 |
2023-02-27 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2023-02-23 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0013 |
2023-02-15 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-01-27 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0018 Published in the DC Register |
2023-01-17 | Council | First Reading |
2023-01-17 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-01-13 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |