DC B25-0020 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Law L25-0003, Effective from May 25, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 008442
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Law L25-0003, Effective from May 25, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 008442
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-20 would order the closing of a portion of Half Street, S.W., adjacent to Lot 12 in Square 660, in Ward 6.
Title
Closing of a Portion of Half Street, S.W., Adjacent to Square 660 Act of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-16 | Council | Law L25-0003, Effective from May 25, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 008442 |
2023-04-13 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2023-03-31 | Council | Act A25-0064 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 003840 |
2023-03-27 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2023-03-24 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0064 |
2023-03-13 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 27, 2023 |
2023-03-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-03-07 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2023-02-07 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2023-02-07 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B25-0020 |
2023-01-20 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0020 Published in the DC Register |
2023-01-17 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2023-01-11 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |