DC B25-0042 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Law L25-0115, Effective from Jan 26, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 001663
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Law L25-0115, Effective from Jan 26, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 001663
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-42 would eliminate mandatory 6-month or 1-year divorce waiting periods that parties are required to show before a divorce is granted in the District of Columbia.
Title
Grounds for Divorce, Legal Separation, and Annulment Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Janeese Lewis George [D] | Cnc. Brooke Pinto [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] |
Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-11-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-03 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-10-03 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-16 | Council | Law L25-0115, Effective from Jan 26, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 001663 |
2023-12-08 | Council | Act A25-0322 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 015622 |
2023-12-07 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2023-12-04 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2023-12-03 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0322 |
2023-11-17 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 4, 2023 |
2023-11-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-10-03 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2023-09-28 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2023-09-26 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B25-0042 |
2023-09-25 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2023-06-08 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-05-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-05-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-02-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-01-27 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0042 Published in the DC Register |
2023-01-19 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |