DC B25-0044 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-02 - Law L25-0188, Effective from Jul 19, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 009561
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-02 - Law L25-0188, Effective from Jul 19, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 009561
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-44 would give the Family Division of the Superior Court jurisdiction to appoint, modify, and terminate a new class of legal guardianship for vulnerable youth, defined as an unmarried noncitizen who is under 21 years old.
Title
Vulnerable Youth Guardianship Protection Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Brooke Pinto [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-02 | Council | Law L25-0188, Effective from Jul 19, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 009561 |
2024-06-07 | Council | Act A25-0477 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 006688 |
2024-06-05 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2024-05-30 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2024-05-29 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0477 |
2024-05-21 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 3, 2024 |
2024-05-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2024-04-02 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2024-03-27 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2024-03-25 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B25-0044 |
2024-03-22 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2023-06-08 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-05-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-05-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-02-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-01-27 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0044 Published in the DC Register |
2023-01-19 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |