DC B25-0149 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - Law L25-0134, Effective from Mar 01, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 002686
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - Law L25-0134, Effective from Mar 01, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 002686
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-149 would authorize the establishment and administration of the Friendship Heights Business Improvement District.
Title
Friendship Heights Business Improvement District Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-12-19 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-12-05 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-05 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-15 | Council | Law L25-0134, Effective from Mar 01, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 002686 |
2024-01-19 | Council | Act A25-0364 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 000867 |
2024-01-18 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2024-01-11 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2024-01-10 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0364 |
2023-12-28 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 12, 2024 |
2023-12-19 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-12-05 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2023-11-30 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2023-11-28 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B25-0149 |
2023-11-27 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2023-06-08 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-05-19 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-05-17 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-05-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-05-03 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-03-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2023-03-03 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0149 Published in the DC Register |
2023-02-23 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |