DC B25-0182 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-19 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-19 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-182 would grant small condominium buildings with eight or fewer units eligibility for residential solid waste management services from the District. It would also require the Chief Financial Officer to undertake a study of the solid waste tax credit deduction issued to owners of condominium living units or homeowners who pay for commercial solid waste collection services.
Title
Taking Rubbish Away from Small Homes Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
Cnc. Christina Henderson [I] | Cnc. Janeese Lewis George [D] | Cnc. Brooke Pinto [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] |
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Zachary Parker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-19 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-09-29 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-09-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-06-09 | Council | Referred to Committee on Public Works and Operations |
2023-06-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Public Works and Operations |
2023-03-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0182 Published in the DC Register |
2023-03-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2023-03-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0182 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/52452/Introduction/B25-0182-Introduction.pdf |