DC B25-0337 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-14 - Act A25-0167 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 009741, Expires on Oct 08, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-14 - Act A25-0167 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 009741, Expires on Oct 08, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Children’s National Hospital Research and Innovation Campus Equitable Tax Relief Emergency Amendment Act of 2023
Title
Children’s National Hospital Research and Innovation Campus Equitable Tax Relief Emergency Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-20 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-14 | Council | Act A25-0167 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 009741, Expires on Oct 08, 2023 |
2023-07-11 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2023-07-10 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0167, Expires on Oct 08, 2023 |
2023-06-27 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 12, 2023 |
2023-06-20 | Council | Final Reading |
2023-06-20 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-06-15 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |