DC B25-0344 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-05 - Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-05 - Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Office of Unified Communications Transparency and Accuracy Amendment Act of 2023
Title
Office of Unified Communications Transparency and Accuracy Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-10-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-10-05 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-10-05 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-10-05 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-09-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-09-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-06-23 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0344 Published in the DC Register |
2023-06-20 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-06-15 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0344 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/53295/Introduction/B25-0344-Introduction.pdf |