DC B25-0424 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-09-17 - First Reading, CC
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-09-17 - First Reading, CC
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-424 would exempt from disclosure critical infrastructure information or plans for the critical infrastructure of the District of Columbia Water and Sewer Authority.
Title
DC Water Critical Infrastructure Freedom of Information Clarification Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-09-17 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-17 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2024-09-12 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2024-07-12 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B25-0424 |
2024-07-10 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2024-03-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-03-04 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-03-04 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-02-23 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-02-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-09-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2023-07-21 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0424 Published in the DC Register |
2023-07-11 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |