DC B25-0464 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-02 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-02 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-464 would amend the Grandparent Caregivers Pilot Program Establishment Act of 2005 by changing the income eligibility requirements through which a grandparent or close relative of a child may be eligible to receive subsidy payments for the care and custody of a child.
Title
Grandparent and Caregiver Subsidy Eligibility Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-02 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-10-13 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-10-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-09-22 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0464 Published in the DC Register |
2023-09-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Facilities and Family Services |
2023-09-18 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0464 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/53785/Introduction/B25-0464-Introduction.pdf |