DC B25-0517 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-03 - Act A25-0278 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 014485, Expires on Jan 28, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-03 - Act A25-0278 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 014485, Expires on Jan 28, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
DC Water Critical Infrastructure Freedom of Information Clarification Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023
Title
DC Water Critical Infrastructure Freedom of Information Clarification Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-10-03 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-03 | Council | Act A25-0278 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 014485, Expires on Jan 28, 2024 |
2023-10-31 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2023-10-30 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0278, Expires on Jan 28, 2024 |
2023-10-17 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 31, 2023 |
2023-10-03 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-10-03 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-10-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |