DC B25-0542 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - Law L25-0185, Effective from Jun 12, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 007363
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - Law L25-0185, Effective from Jun 12, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 007363
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-542 would officially designate the public alley system bounded by East Capitol Street, S.E., 12th Street, S.E., Independence Avenue, S.E., and 11th Street. S.E. in Ward 6, as “Sladen’s Court”.
Title
Sladen's Court Designation Act of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-28 | Council | Law L25-0185, Effective from Jun 12, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 007363 |
2024-05-03 | Council | Act A25-0467 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 005041 |
2024-04-30 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2024-04-29 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2024-04-25 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0467 |
2024-04-15 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 30, 2024 |
2024-04-02 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2024-03-05 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2024-03-01 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2024-02-20 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B25-0542 |
2023-12-15 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-11-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-11-20 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-11-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2023-10-27 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0542 Published in the DC Register |
2023-10-18 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |